HB0883 (CH0620)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Study of Safe and Healthy School Hours for Maryland Public Schools

Sponsored by:

Delegate Miller, A.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20142/5/2014First Reading Ways and Means
2/6/20142/6/2014Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20143/14/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/14/20143/11/2014Favorable with Amendments {905762/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/15/20143/12/2014Third Reading Passed (129-0)48A
Senate3/18/20143/13/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20143/23/2014Favorable with Amendments {584337/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
4/2/20143/24/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)58
House4/4/20143/28/2014House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (136-0)64
Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage5/15/20145/15/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2014 11:39 A.M.