HB0904 (CH0621)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Children, Youth, and Family Services - Local Management Boards and State Spending - Information Collection and Report

Sponsored by:

Delegate Valentino-Smith

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20142/5/2014First Reading Appropriations
2/12/20142/12/2014Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/10/20143/10/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/11/20143/8/2014Favorable with Amendments {674669/1 Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/12/20143/9/2014Third Reading Passed (135-0)45
Senate3/13/20143/10/2014First Reading Budget and Taxation44
3/19/20143/19/2014Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20144/2/2014Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/3/20143/25/2014Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/5/20143/27/2014Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20143/30/2014Returned Passed66
Post Passage5/15/20145/15/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:51 P.M.