HB0920 (CH0335)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Primary and Secondary Education - Certificated School Personnel - Training Requirement

Sponsored by:

Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20172/6/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/10/20172/10/2017Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/9/20173/9/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/10/20173/10/2017Favorable with Amendments {865264/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/14/20173/11/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)45
Senate3/15/20173/15/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44
3/20/20173/20/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable with Amendments {504230/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)63A
House4/10/20174/5/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed (135-0)70
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:03 P.M.