HB0930

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lee

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/8/20132/8/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20133/23/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/23/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {902412/1 Report Adopted53A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53A
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.