HB0941 (CH0656)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Fraudulent Liens - Prohibition

Sponsored by:

Delegate Arora

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/8/20132/8/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20133/22/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/22/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {852017/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.