HB0942 (CH0301)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care Records

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/8/20132/8/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2/19/20132/19/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {712316/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/22/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)52
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.