HB0944

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Home Instruction Programs - Private Tutors

Sponsored by:

Delegate Smigiel

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20142/5/2014First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20142/12/2014Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/14/20142/14/2014Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2/24/20142/24/2014Hearing cancelled
3/3/20143/3/2014Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 3, 2014 1:40 P.M.