HB0965 (CH0291)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015

Sponsored by:

Delegate Haynes

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/13/20152/13/2015First Reading Ways and Means
2/18/20152/18/2015Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20154/2/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/2/20153/29/2015Favorable with Amendments {625268/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20153/30/2015Third Reading Passed (137-0)60
Senate4/6/20153/30/2015First Reading Senate Rules57
4/11/20154/11/2015Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
4/13/20154/13/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/13/20154/5/2015Favorable with Amendments {629737/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/13/20154/6/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)64
House4/13/20154/9/2015House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed (136-2)70
Passed Enrolled70
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:45 P.M.