HB0974

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Election Law - Subsequent Election Absentee Ballot List

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kramer

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing cancelled
2/26/20132/26/2013Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/25/20133/25/2013Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/25/20133/21/2013Favorable Report Adopted54
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 54
Second Reading Passed54
3/25/20133/22/2013Third Reading Passed (108-29)55
Senate3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs53
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.