HB0978 (CH0029)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Accountability - Consolidated State Plan and Support and Improvement Plans (Protect Our Schools Act of 2017)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/5/2017) - Chapter 29


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20172/6/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/14/20172/14/2017Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable with Amendments {665462/1 Report Adopted40
Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Cluster) Adopted 40
3/8/20173/8/2017Floor Amendment {703925/1 (Delegate Cluster) Rejected (48-89)41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/10/20173/10/2017Third Reading Passed (91-46)43
Senate3/13/20173/13/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs42
3/24/20173/24/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/20173/22/2017Favorable with Amendments {934433/151
Special Order until later today (Senator Miller) Adopted 51
Favorable with Amendments {934433/151
Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted51
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments {934433/152
Committee Amendment Adopted52
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted52
Floor Amendment {823929/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted (32-13)52
Floor Amendment {693927/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-32)52
Floor Amendment {503526/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-33)52
Floor Amendment {503721/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (14-32)52
Floor Amendment {433821/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted52
Floor Amendment {143922/1 (Senator Ferguson) Withdrawn52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/28/20173/24/2017Floor Amendment {743322/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted53
Floor Amendment {483821/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-33)53
Motion limit debate (Senator Peters) Adopted (33-14)53
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-15)53
House3/28/20173/24/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments58
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Davis) Adopted (88-49)58
Third Reading Passed (87-50)58
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/5/20174/5/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House4/6/20173/30/2017Veto overridden (90-50)64
Senate4/6/20173/31/2017Veto overridden (32-15)60
Post Passage4/6/20174/6/2017Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/5/2017) - Chapter 29

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2017 12:32 P.M.