HB0984 (CH0330)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session



Open Meetings Act - Retention of Minutes and Recordings - Revision

Sponsored by:

Delegate Saab


Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/17/20162/17/2016Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
3/9/20163/9/2016Favorable Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed41
3/14/20163/11/2016Third Reading Passed (135-0)43A
Senate3/15/20163/15/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20163/31/2016Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed (44-0)61A
House4/7/20164/1/2016Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/10/20165/10/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

October 24, 2017 5:03 P.M.