HB0997 (CH0754)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Vehicle Laws - Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Operation on Sidewalks and in Crosswalks

Sponsored by:

Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 754


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20172/8/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/14/20173/11/2017Favorable with Amendments {320212/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20173/12/2017Third Reading Passed (137-0)46A
Senate3/16/20173/16/2017First Reading Finance45
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable Report by Finance
4/3/20173/28/2017Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/4/20173/29/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)58
House4/4/20173/28/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 754

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 25, 2017 12:52 P.M.