HB0999 (CH0702)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kaiser

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 702


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20162/12/2016Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {605663/2 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20163/16/2016Third Reading Passed (138-0)48
Senate3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation47A
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20164/6/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/6/20163/31/2016Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)61
House4/7/20164/1/2016Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/28/20165/28/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 702

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:03 P.M.