HB1010

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lierman

Status:

Vote on Veto Special Ordered until 1/31/2017


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Environment and Transportation
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2/15/20162/15/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20163/19/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/19/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments {460910/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/21/20163/18/2016Third Reading Passed (84-51)50
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Finance48A
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20163/28/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/11/20164/11/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/11/20164/5/2016Favorable with Amendments {487376/165
Special Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted 65
4/11/20164/6/2016Favorable with Amendments {487376/166
Special Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted 66
Favorable with Amendments {487376/166
Committee Amendment Adopted66
Special Order until later today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 66
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66
4/11/20164/7/2016Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted 67
Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-29)67
Motion limit debate (Senator Pugh) Adopted (30-15)67
Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {483521/1 Rejected (17-29)67
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (26-19)67
House4/11/20164/9/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments72
Third Reading Passed (87-51)72
Passed Enrolled72
Post Passage5/27/20165/27/2016Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House1/11/20171/11/2017Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/17 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
1/17/20171/17/2017Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/24 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
1/24/20171/24/2017Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/31 (Delegate Frick) Adopted

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 24, 2017 11:38 A.M.