HB1012 (CH0289)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Tax Credit - Commuter Benefits - Eligibility and Credit Amount

Sponsored by:

Delegate McCray

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2/12/20162/12/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
3/16/20163/16/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {885864/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/19/20163/17/2016Third Reading Passed (130-3)49
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation48A
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20163/29/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
4/9/20164/9/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/9/20164/3/2016Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/11/20164/4/2016Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {313525/1 Adopted64
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)64
House4/11/20164/6/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments69
Third Reading Passed (138-0)69
Passed Enrolled69
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 26, 2016 12:48 P.M.