HB1014 (CH0690)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

College Affordability Act of 2016

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jones

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {195361/1 Report Adopted46
Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 46
3/18/20163/16/2016Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {353620/1 Rejected (48-84)48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/19/20163/17/2016Third Reading Passed (89-45)49
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation48A
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20163/29/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/30/20163/26/2016Favorable with Amendments {519230/155
Laid Over (Senator Brochin) Adopted55
3/31/20163/27/2016Favorable with Amendments {519230/1 Report Adopted56A
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {883126/1 Adopted56A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments56A
4/1/20163/28/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)57
House4/6/20163/30/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (92-45)62
Passed Enrolled62
Post Passage5/28/20165/28/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.