HB1031 (CH0518)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Estate Tax and Income Tax - Marital Deduction and Subtraction Modification for Health Insurance

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable with Amendments {545163/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/6/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (130-0)65
Senate4/8/20134/2/2013First Reading Senate Rules64
4/8/20134/8/2013Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/8/20134/5/2013Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
4/8/20134/6/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)68
House4/8/20134/5/2013Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.