HB1032 (CH0293)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety - Transport of Weapons on School Property - Retired Law Enforcement Officers

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jackson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/13/20152/13/2015First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20153/19/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/20/20153/18/2015Favorable with Amendments {672419/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/23/20153/20/2015Third Reading Passed (136-1)50
Senate3/23/20153/20/2015First Reading Judicial Proceedings47A
3/24/20153/24/2015Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/11/20154/11/2015Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/11/20154/4/2015Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/13/20154/5/2015Third Reading Passed (47-0)63
House4/13/20154/8/2015Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:45 P.M.