HB1066 (CH0176)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Fire Drill Requirements - State Fire Prevention Code

Sponsored by:

Delegate Ebersole

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20172/8/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/14/20172/14/2017Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed40
3/9/20173/9/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)42
Senate3/10/20173/10/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs41
4/4/20174/4/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20173/29/2017Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/5/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/6/20173/30/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:04 P.M.