HB1081

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Miller, A.

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/13/20152/13/2015First Reading Ways and Means
2/18/20152/18/2015Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20153/23/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/23/20153/21/2015Favorable with Amendments {785460/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/24/20153/22/2015Third Reading Passed (124-14)52
Senate3/25/20153/22/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs49
3/26/20153/26/2015Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20154/9/2015Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:45 P.M.