HB1083 (CH0028)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care

Sponsored by:

Delegate Pendergrass

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20172/9/2017First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/15/20172/15/2017Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20173/6/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/14/20173/11/2017Favorable with Amendments {856381/1 Report Adopted45
Floor Amendment {683224/1 (Delegate Simonaire) Rejected (47-89)45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/16/20173/13/2017Third Reading Passed (90-51)47
Senate3/17/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46
3/23/20173/23/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20173/24/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/24/20173/22/2017Favorable51
Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Hough) Adopted 51
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable Report Adopted52
Floor Amendment {833927/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-30)52
Floor Amendment {263322/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (14-32)52
Floor Amendment {663825/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (15-31)52
Floor Amendment {423027/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-31)52
Floor Amendment {713928/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (15-31)52
Second Reading Passed52
3/28/20173/24/2017Floor Amendment {493721/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-32)53
Third Reading Passed (32-15)53
House3/28/20173/24/2017Returned Passed58
Post Passage4/6/20174/6/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.