HB1090 (CH0515)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018

Sponsored by:

Delegate Afzali

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20182/7/2018First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {923594/1 Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/14/20183/11/2018Third Reading Passed (134-0)45
Senate3/15/20183/15/2018First Reading Finance47
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20184/6/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/6/20184/1/2018Favorable with Amendments {857677/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/9/20184/2/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)64
House4/9/20184/2/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (140-0)67
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:34 P.M.