HB1095

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Notification of Eligibility by Local Departments of Social Services

Sponsored by:

Delegate Platt

Status:

Veto sustained (0-135)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/11/20162/11/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20162/12/2016Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20163/16/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {215863/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20163/16/2016Third Reading Passed (140-0)48
Senate3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47A
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20163/31/2016Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed (44-0)61A
House4/7/20164/1/2016Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/27/20165/27/2016Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
House1/17/20171/17/2017Veto sustained (0-135)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.