HB1106 (CH0001)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions

Sponsored by:

Delegate Frick

Status:

Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/11/20162/11/2016First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/17/20163/15/2016Favorable with Amendments {653295/1 Report Adopted47
Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Frick) Adopted 47
3/19/20163/17/2016Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {523720/1 Withdrawn49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/21/20163/18/2016Third Reading Passed (92-43)50
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Finance48A
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20164/7/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/7/20164/1/2016Favorable with Amendments {507779/1 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/11/20164/3/2016Special Order until later today (Senator Ready) Adopted 63A
4/11/20164/5/2016Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/165
Special Order until later today (Senator McFadden) Adopted 65
Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/165
Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 65
4/11/20164/6/2016Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/1 Rejected (16-29)66
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14)66
House4/11/20164/7/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed (92-46)70
Passed Enrolled70
Post Passage5/27/20165/27/2016Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House1/11/20171/11/2017Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/17 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
1/17/20171/17/2017Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/24 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
1/24/20171/24/2017Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/31 (Delegate Frick) Adopted
1/31/20171/31/2017Veto overridden (88-51)
Senate2/2/20172/2/2017Veto overridden (32-13)
Post Passage2/2/20172/2/2017Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.