Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session



State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Expansion of Participating Units

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morhaim


In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20182/8/2018First Reading Appropriations
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2/14/20182/14/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
3/1/20183/1/2018Hearing canceled
3/5/20183/5/2018Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

March 2, 2018 1:31 P.M.