HB1136 (CH0401)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Student Hearing and Vision Screenings – Reporting Requirements

Sponsored by:

Delegate Valentino-Smith

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20182/8/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {645462/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (135-1)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48B
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.