HB1139 (CH0300)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Community School Strategy - Required Notice and Support

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, M.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/11/20162/11/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20162/12/2016Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20164/1/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/1/20163/27/2016Favorable with Amendments {785060/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/4/20163/28/2016Third Reading Passed (132-2)60
Senate4/4/20163/29/2016First Reading Senate Rules58
4/5/20164/6/2016Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20164/6/2016Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
4/11/20164/11/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/11/20164/4/2016Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/11/20164/5/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)65
House4/11/20164/7/2016Returned Passed70
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.