HB1148 (CH0297)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Natural Resources - Shark Fins - Restriction on Possession or Distribution

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20133/23/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/23/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {460419/1 Report Adopted53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (119-15)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs52
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (39-5)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.