HB1161 (CH0671)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Commission on Special Education Access and Equity

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, A.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {935664/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments {314437/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (136-1)67
Passed Enrolled67
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.