HB1176 (CH0471)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - Accessibility

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {945469/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs51
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.