HB1233

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Administration of Standardized Tests and Mandated Assessments - Notice

Sponsored by:

Delegate Ebersole

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/12/20162/12/2016First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {225869/1 Report Adopted46
Special Order until next session (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 46
3/17/20163/15/2016Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 47
3/18/20163/16/2016Floor Amendment (Delegate Ebersole) {823127/1 Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20163/19/2016Third Reading Passed (136-0)51
Senate3/22/20163/20/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs49
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:05 P.M.