HB1240 (CH0715)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Individualized Education Programs - Studies

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kaiser

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/14/20172/14/2017Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {365065/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/17/20173/14/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)48
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20173/29/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/3/2017Favorable with Amendments {164239/1 Report Adopted63A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63A
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted63A
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-0)63A
House4/10/20174/5/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed (133-0)70
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:05 P.M.