HB1254 (CH0775)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education – School Discipline – Data Collection

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, A.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/14/20183/11/2018Favorable with Amendments {515363/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (115-21)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:18 P.M.