HB1269 (CH0060)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited Income

Sponsored by:

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/18/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments {545069/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (132-0)50
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46A
3/24/20173/24/2017Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20173/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/6/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/6/20173/30/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.