HB1283

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License

Sponsored by:

Delegate Branch

Status:

In the House - Passed Enrolled


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Economic Matters
2/9/20172/9/2017Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/16/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {343391/1 Report Adopted47
Special Order until 03/17 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 47
3/17/20173/14/2017Floor Amendment {793522/1 (Delegate Davis) Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/18/20173/15/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)49
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/7/20174/1/2017Favorable with Amendments {564132/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Young) Rejected (5-33)61
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Conway) Adopted (45-1)61
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)61
House4/8/20174/1/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (119-15)66
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.