HB1297 (CH0330)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings

Sponsored by:

Delegate Zucker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/19/20133/16/2013Favorable with Amendments {243396/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20133/17/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)50
Senate3/21/20133/19/2013First Reading Finance50
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20134/2/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {377777/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)60
House4/6/20134/1/2013House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments65
House Requests Senate Recede65
Senate4/8/20134/4/2013Senate Refuses to Recede66
Conference Committee Appointed66
Senators Klausmeier, Kittleman, and Garagiola66
House4/8/20134/4/2013Conference Committee Appointed68
Delegates Jameson, Haddaway-Riccio, and Schulz68
Senate4/8/20134/7/2013Conference Committee Report Adopted69
Third Reading Passed (44-0)69
House4/8/20134/5/2013Conference Committee Report Adopted69
Third Reading Passed (136-0)69
Passed Enrolled69
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.