HB1325 (CH0013)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Oil and Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition

Sponsored by:

Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/13/20172/13/2017Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable with Amendments {200614/1 Report Adopted40
Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate McKay) Adopted 40
3/8/20173/8/2017Floor Amendment {433428/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (41-90)41
Floor Amendment {583222/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (44-86)41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/10/20173/10/2017Motion vote previous question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted43
Third Reading Passed (97-40)43
Senate3/13/20173/13/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs42
3/23/20173/23/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/20173/21/2017Favorable50
Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 50
3/24/20173/22/2017Favorable Report Adopted (35-12)51
Second Reading Passed51
3/27/20173/23/2017Floor Amendment {123923/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected52
Third Reading Passed (36-10)52
House3/27/20173/22/2017Returned Passed56
Post Passage4/4/20174/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 4, 2017 2:38 P.M.