HB1334

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking PG/MC 112-14

Sponsored by:

Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20142/7/2014First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20143/15/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/15/20143/12/2014Favorable with Amendments {113599/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/17/20143/13/2014Third Reading Passed (92-44)49
Senate3/18/20143/13/2014First Reading Finance47
3/19/20143/19/2014Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/25/20143/25/2014Hearing cancelled
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:53 P.M.