HB1439

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Calvert County - Bonding Authority

Sponsored by:

Calvert County Delegation

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Appropriations
2/15/20172/15/2017Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable Report by Appropriations
3/18/20173/15/2017Favorable Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed49
3/20/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (134-0)50
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46A
3/24/20173/24/2017Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20173/30/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
4/3/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)57
House4/4/20173/28/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 30, 2017 1:02 P.M.