HB1462

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study a Later Starting Time for Maryland Public Schools

Sponsored by:

Delegate Miller, A.

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/5/20133/6/2013Rereferred to Ways and Means
3/6/20133/6/2013Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/25/20133/25/2013Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/25/20133/21/2013Favorable Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed54
3/25/20133/22/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)55
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs52
3/28/20133/28/2013Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.