HB1463 (CH0417)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Veterinary Practitioners - Animal Cruelty and Animal Fighting - Reporting

Sponsored by:

Delegate Frush

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/13/20172/13/2017Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20173/18/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/18/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments {760315/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (118-15)51
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)63A
House4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.