HB1468 (CH0793)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Transit - Job Access and Reverse Commute (JARC) Program

Sponsored by:

Delegate Beidle

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 793


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20183/6/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
3/17/20183/17/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/17/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {930015/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
4/6/20184/6/2018Favorable Report by Finance
4/6/20184/1/2018Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/9/20184/2/2018Third Reading Passed (44-0)64
House4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 793

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:19 P.M.