HB1499 (CH0419)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/5/20133/6/2013Rereferred to Ways and Means
3/6/20133/6/2013Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {145068/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs51
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20133/27/2013Favorable with Amendments {744738/158
Special Order until later today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 58
Favorable with Amendments {744738/158
Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 58
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {744738/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20133/29/2013Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {623027/1 Adopted60
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2)60
House4/8/20134/2/2013House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments66
House Requests Senate Recede66
Conference Committee Appointed66
Delegates Cardin, Summers, and George66
Senate4/8/20134/4/2013Senate Refuses to Recede66
Conference Committee Appointed66
Senators Ferguson, Dyson, and Jennings66
House4/8/20134/4/2013Conference Committee Report Adopted68
Third Reading Passed (128-7)68
Senate4/8/20134/6/2013Conference Committee Report Adopted68
Third Reading Passed (42-2)68
House4/8/20134/5/2013Passed Enrolled68
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.