HB1503 (CH0141)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Adult Education - GED Testing Fees - Exemption for Homeless Youth

Sponsored by:

Delegate Simonaire

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/12/20162/12/2016First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/10/20163/10/2016Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/11/20163/11/2016Favorable Report Adopted43
Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {533226/143
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Davis) Adopted 43
3/15/20163/12/2016Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {533226/1 Withdrawn44
Second Reading Passed44
3/16/20163/13/2016Third Reading Passed (139-0)45
Senate3/17/20163/17/2016First Reading Finance46
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20164/1/2016Favorable Report by Finance
4/1/20163/28/2016Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/4/20163/29/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)58
House4/5/20163/29/2016Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/12/20164/12/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:06 P.M.