HB1510 (CH0460)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session



Behavioral Health Administration - Establishment and Duties

Sponsored by:

Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee


Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/27/20142/27/2014First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/20143/4/2014Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
3/5/20143/5/2014Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20143/7/2014Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/14 at 12:30 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/1/20143/25/2014Favorable with Amendments {216584/2 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/2/20143/26/2014Third Reading Passed (132-0)62
Senate4/3/20143/25/2014First Reading Senate Rules59
4/7/20144/7/2014Rereferred to Finance
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/7/20143/30/2014Favorable with Amendments {177574/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/7/20143/31/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)65
House4/7/20144/3/2014House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed (135-1)70
Passed Enrolled70
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

October 24, 2017 1:54 P.M.