HB1560

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Consent

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly

Status:

In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/17/20172/17/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/8/20173/8/2017Rereferred to Ways and Means
3/9/20173/9/2017Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {445665/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/18/20173/15/2017Third Reading Passed (112-28)49
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20173/29/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable62
Special Order until next session (Senator Muse) Adopted 62
4/10/20174/3/2017Favorable Report Adopted63A
Floor Amendment {233022/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (18-26)63A
Special Order until later today (Senator Miller) Adopted 63A
Floor Amendment {203324/1 (Senator Muse) Adopted (26-19)63A
Floor Amendment {573822/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (20-25)63A
Floor Amendment {813324/1 (Senator Ready) Withdrawn63A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63a

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:07 P.M.