HB1607 (CH0565)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {855962/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (138-0)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48B
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {514039/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/7/20183/31/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (137-0)65
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:37 P.M.