HB1646

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer

Sponsored by:

Delegate Atterbeary

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Judiciary
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {622411/1 Report Adopted44
Special Order until next session (Delegate Saab) Adopted 44
3/14/20183/11/2018Floor Amendment {573523/1 (Delegate Vogt) Rejected (44-87)45
Floor Amendment {403126/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (46-89)45
Floor Amendment {363822/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (129-5)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48A
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments {208176/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments61
House Requests Senate Recede61
Conference Committee Appointed61
Delegates Moon, Queen, and Malone61
Senate4/6/20184/1/2018Senate Refuses to Recede63
Conference Committee Appointed63
Senators Zirkin, Ready, and Muse63
House4/9/20184/1/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted66
Third Reading Passed (135-4)66
Senate4/9/20184/3/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted65
Third Reading Passed (45-0)65
House4/9/20184/1/2018Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.