HB1783 (CH0014)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

21st Century School Facilities Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jones

Status:

Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House3/1/20183/1/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/20183/5/2018Rereferred to Appropriations
3/5/20183/5/2018Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20183/23/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/23/20183/18/2018Favorable with Amendments {604465/1 Report Adopted52A
Special Order until 3/26 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 52A
3/26/20183/19/2018Floor Amendment {153725/1 (Delegate Saab) Adopted53
Floor Amendment {563124/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (49-85)53
Floor Amendment {763327/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (46-86)53
Floor Amendment {313924/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (48-83)53
Floor Amendment {723622/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (44-85)53
Floor Amendment {933322/1 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/27/20183/20/2018Motion vote previous question (Delegate Lisanti) Adopted54
Third Reading Passed (92-48)54
Senate3/27/20183/23/2018First Reading Senate Rules54
3/28/20183/28/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/28/20183/24/2018Favorable55
Favorable Report Adopted (27-15)55A
Floor Amendment {273327/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (18-27)55A
Floor Amendment {283727/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {653420/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (20-25)55A
Floor Amendment {293426/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {623522/2 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (14-31)55A
Floor Amendment {403723/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {563628/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (17-27)55A
Floor Amendment {533927/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {273125/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {163520/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {263921/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {413624/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-30)55A
Floor Amendment {323020/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-29)55A
Floor Amendment {493421/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-26)55A
Floor Amendment {963722/1 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (17-27)55A
Floor Amendment {533126/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (16-29)55A
Floor Amendment {373328/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {993326/1 (Senator Jennings)55A
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted55a
3/28/20183/25/2018Floor Amendment {993326/1 (Senator Jennings) Withdrawn56
Second Reading Passed56
3/29/20183/26/2018Motion limit debate (Senator Peters) Adopted57
Floor Amendment {653428/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-26)57
Third Reading Passed (29-14)57
House3/30/20183/23/2018Returned Passed57
Post Passage4/4/20184/4/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House4/5/20183/27/2018Veto overridden (90-48)61
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018Veto overridden (29-15)62
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2018 4:01 P.M.