SB0004 (CH0160)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Personnel - Applicants for Employment - Criminal History Records Checks

Sponsored by:

Senator Pugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/25/201210/25/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Finance
1/8/20131/8/2013Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
1/9/20131/9/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
1/21/20131/21/2013Favorable Report by Finance
1/22/20131/22/2013Favorable Report Adopted9
Second Reading Passed9
1/24/20131/24/2013Third Reading Passed (33-9)11
House1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Appropriations13
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {114767/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (102-34)63
Senate4/5/20134/1/2013Senate Concur - House Amendments63
Third Reading Passed (39-4)63
Passed Enrolled63
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:06 P.M.